NH SB157 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2498h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2498h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to encouraging high school students to take and pass a United States citizenship test.
Title
Relative to encouraging high school students to take and pass a United States citizenship test.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2498h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 19 |
2015-09-09 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-09-09 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-06-04 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 6/9/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-05-27 | House | ==CANCELED==Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/9/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-04-30 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/12/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-04-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 4/9/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 0677s New Title, 0840s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Sen. Kelly Floor Amendment #2015-0840s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0677s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0677s, New Title, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 2/10/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 4 |