NH SB156 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB156
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-24 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-24 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to management of the secure psychiatric unit facility at New Hampshire hospital.
Title
Relative to management of the secure psychiatric unit facility at New Hampshire hospital.
Sponsors
Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/18/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/03/2021, 08:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB156 (Carry Over) 2021-09-24 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar