NH SB155 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to permissible campaign contributions by business organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to permissible campaign contributions by business organizations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-01-30SenateHearing: 02/06/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback