NH SB155 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0184; Effective 07/02/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0184; Effective 07/02/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring revenue from commemorative liquor bottles to be used for the preservation of state house Civil War battle flags.
Title
Requiring revenue from commemorative liquor bottles to be used for the preservation of state house Civil War battle flags.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0184; Effective 07/02/2013 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1576 |
2013-05-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for June 5 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1430 |
2013-05-22 | House | Executive Session: 5/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-05-15 | House | Public Hearing: 5/21/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 41, PG.1419 |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Division Vote 292-34; House Journal 41, PG.1419 |
2013-05-08 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Notter); House Journal 41, PG.1386 |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1197 |
2013-04-09 | House | Rescheduled Executive Session: 4/24/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 ==Or Following House Session== |
2013-04-09 | House | Rescheduled Public Hearing: 4/24/2013 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 104 ==Or Following House Session== |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 35, PG.1126 |
2013-04-03 | House | Vacated from Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 35, PG.1126 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 31, PG.1076 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/21/13; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0485s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0485s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved to Remove SB 155-FN-A from the Consent Calendar; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0485s, New Title, 3/7/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Hearing: 2/13/13, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin; Senate Journal 5 |