NH SB153 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a law enforcement officers, professional firefighters, and emergency medical technicians career development, recruitment, and retention program and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing a law enforcement officers, professional firefighters, and emergency medical technicians career development, recruitment, and retention program and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2023; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved Ought to Pass; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0988s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2023-0988s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved to Remove SB 153 from the Consent Calendar; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |