NH SB152 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 153
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 153
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to affordable housing program funding.
Title
Relative to affordable housing program funding.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0450s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0450s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 153 |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 23 |
2021-05-04 | House | Division III Work Session: 05/10/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93701004543 |
2021-04-28 | House | Public Hearing: 05/10/2021 11:40 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-04-01 | House | Vacated and Referred to Finance (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0450s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0450s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0450s, 03/04/2021; Senate Calendar 12 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/17/2021, 08:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |