NH SB151 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to renewable energy procurement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to renewable energy procurement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateRereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-03-30SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/01/2021; Senate Calendar 17A
2021-03-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0795s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0795s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0795s, 03/18/2021; Senate Calendar 15
2021-03-03SenateRemote Hearing: 03/08/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 14
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=862&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB151
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=853&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=853
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=176&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0151&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB151&ddlsponsors=&lsr=862
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=177&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0151&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB151&ddlsponsors=&lsr=862
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=176&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0151&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB151&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0862
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=177&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0151&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB151&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0862
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=264&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0151&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB151&ddlsponsors=&lsr=862

Bill Comments

feedback