NH SB149 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing individuals and certain businesses to purchase health insurance from out-of-state companies.
Title
Authorizing individuals and certain businesses to purchase health insurance from out-of-state companies.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Rep. Michael Vose [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] |
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The Chair rescinded OT3rdg, 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0796s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0796s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0796s, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Hearing: 02/14/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |