NH SB149 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.98
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.98
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the rate of the meals and rooms tax and the distribution formula for meals and rooms tax revenue.
Title
Relative to the rate of the meals and rooms tax and the distribution formula for meals and rooms tax revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.98 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Hearing: 2/23/11, Room 100, State House, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means, Senate Journal 5, Pg.45 |