NH SB145 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Pending Motion Rerefer to Committee; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Pending Motion Rerefer to Committee; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting smoking in motor vehicles when a passenger under the age of 16 is in the vehicle.
Title
Prohibiting smoking in motor vehicles when a passenger under the age of 16 is in the vehicle.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Michael Cahill [D] | Rep. Sherry Frost [D] | Rep. James MacKay [D] |
Rep. Skip Berrien [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Pending Motion Rerefer to Committee; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |