NH SB145 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Sen. Boutin Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing publication by electronic means by the probate division.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing publication by electronic means by the probate division.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-07SenateSen. Boutin Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6
2013-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment 0507s, Not Voted On; Senate Journal 8
2013-03-07SenateSen. Bragdon Moved to Remove SB 145-FN from the Consent Calendar; Senate Journal 6
2013-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0507s, 3/7/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2013-01-28SenateHearing: 2/5/13, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7
2013-01-03SenateIntroduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback