NH SB145 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state employees who volunteer as election workers.
Title
Relative to state employees who volunteer as election workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.89 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Hearing: 2/24/11, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration, Senate Journal 5, Pg.45 |