NH SB142 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0214; Effective 10/03/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0214; Effective 10/03/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of forms and rates for property and casualty insurance.
Title
Relative to the regulation of forms and rates for property and casualty insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0214; Effective 10/03/2023 |
2023-07-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 18 |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-07-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2238e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 16 |
2023-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2238e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-06-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 4 |
2023-05-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/10/2023 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-05-03 | House | Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-12 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |