NH SB142 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - II. Remainder Effective 07/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Reestablishing the commission to study the incidence of post-traumatic stress disorder in first responders and reestablishing the commission to study grandfamilies in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reestablishing the commission to study the incidence of post-traumatic stress disorder in first responders and reestablishing the commission to study grandfamilies in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0997s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-03SenateII. Remainder Effective 07/30/2021
2021-08-03SenateI. Section 3 Effective 11/01/2022
2021-08-03SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/30/2021; Chapter 0178
2021-07-15HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-15SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-24SenateConference Committee Report # 2021-1961c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/24/2021; Senate Journal 20
2021-06-24HouseConference Committee Report 2021-1961c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/24/2021
2021-06-17HouseConference Committee Report # 2021-1961c Filed 06/10/2021; House Amendment
2021-06-11SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 06/14/2021, 2:00 p.m., Room 100, State House
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Hill, Greene, Simon, Rouillard 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 16
2021-06-10HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Hill): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 16
2021-06-10SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Carson, Birdsell, Prentiss; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
2021-06-10SenateSen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
2021-06-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1612h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 79
2021-06-03HouseAmendment # 2021-1612h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 79
2021-05-26HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1612h (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 10
2021-05-11HouseExecutive Session: 05/20/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94943238342
2021-04-28HousePublic Hearing: 05/11/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99990261785 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-04-13HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 04/09/2021 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 7 P. 100
2021-04-01SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0997s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-04-01SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0997s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-03-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0997s, 04/01/2021; Senate Calendar 17
2021-03-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0603s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0603s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-03SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0603s, 03/11/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14
2021-02-11SenateRemote Hearing: 02/17/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2021-02-05SenateIntroduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=891&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB142
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=882&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=882
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=882
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=882
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=258&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0142&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB142&ddlsponsors=&lsr=891
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=259&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0142&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB142&ddlsponsors=&lsr=891

Bill Comments 750

feedback