NH SB141 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-12 - Vetoed by Governor 08/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the procedure for conducting firearm background checks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the procedure for conducting firearm background checks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - House - Reconsider (Y: 172 N: 204 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - House - OTP (Y: 197 N: 180 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 181 N: 196 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - House - ITL (Y: 186 N: 191 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - House - Table (Y: 56 N: 319 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1053s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Reconsideration (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Reconsideration (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-12SenateVetoed by Governor 08/10/2021
2021-06-22HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 23
2021-06-22SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/10/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-03HouseReconsider (Rep. Prout): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 172-204 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 104
2021-06-03HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 197-180 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 102
2021-06-03HouseIndefinitely Postpone (Rep. Espitia): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 181-196 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 100
2021-06-03HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 186-191 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 98
2021-06-03HouseLay on Table (Rep. Umberger): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 56-319 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 96
2021-05-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2021-05-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 17
2021-05-10HouseExecutive Session: 05/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97305033264
2021-04-21HousePublic Hearing: 04/28/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97143779905 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-04-13HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 04/09/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 7 P. 100
2021-04-01SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1053s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-04-01SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-1053s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-03-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1053s, 04/01/2021; Senate Calendar 17A
2021-03-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0876s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateSen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on Ought to Pass with Amendment, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 9
2021-03-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0876s, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateSen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2021-0876s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/18/2021; Senate Calendar 15
2021-02-10SenateRemote Hearing: 02/16/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2021-02-05SenateIntroduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=955&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=946&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=946
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=946
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&v=HP&id=946
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=195&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=955
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=196&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=955
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=197&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=955
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=198&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=955
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=195&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0955
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=196&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0955
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=197&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0955
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=198&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0955
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=256&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=955
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=257&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=955
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=152&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=955
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=153&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=955
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=154&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=955
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=155&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=955
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=156&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=SB0141&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB141&ddlsponsors=&lsr=955

Bill Comments

feedback