NH SB140 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopting omnibus legislation making appropriations to the department of health and human services.
Title
Adopting omnibus legislation making appropriations to the department of health and human services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0998s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0998s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0998s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0998s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0998s, 04/01/2021; Senate Calendar 17 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0622s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0622s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0622s, 03/11/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/17/2021, 08:45 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |