NH SB140 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Enrolled 06/06/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to credit for alternative, extended learning, and work-based programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to credit for alternative, extended learning, and work-based programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - OTP (Y: 224 N: 146 NV: 8 Abs: 22) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled 06/06/2019
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 224-146 05/23/2019
2019-05-08HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-08HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/23/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 8
2019-04-18HouseExecutive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-03-27HousePublic Hearing: 04/03/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 11 P. 70
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0647s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0647s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0647s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-02-06SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:45 am; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback