NH SB139 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB139
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-21 - ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-21 - ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to bingo dates.
Title
Relative to bingo dates.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-09-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2021-09-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 104 |
2021-08-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/07/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-05-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Executive Session: 05/11/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91063233087 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-04-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/04/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92340576130 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-04-14 | House | Public Hearing: 04/27/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95145735422 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 4 P. 50 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/18/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/01/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 3 |
Same As/Similar To
SB139 (Carry Over) 2021-09-21 - ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.