NH SB137 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Law Without Signature 06/26/2019; Chapter 0144; Effective 08/25/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the certification of school nurses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the certification of school nurses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27SenateLaw Without Signature 06/26/2019; Chapter 0144; Effective 08/25/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 190-147 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 68
2019-05-01HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 14
2019-04-18HouseExecutive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-04-03HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14
2019-02-21SenateHearing: 03/12/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback