NH SB135 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2023; Chapter 0072; Effective 08/06/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to alternative dispute resolution in special education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to alternative dispute resolution in special education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-08SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/07/2023; Chapter 0072; Effective 08/06/2023
2023-05-31SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/18/2023); Senate Journal 16
2023-05-31HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 04/18/2023
2023-05-04HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 6
2023-04-26HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass 04/19/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
2023-04-12HouseExecutive Session: 04/19/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2023-04-05HousePublic Hearing: 04/11/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2023-03-23HousePublic Hearing: 03/29/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
2023-03-20HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Education
2023-03-09SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9
2023-02-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/09/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12
2023-02-14SenateHearing: 02/21/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 11
2023-01-19SenateIntroduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback