NH SB135 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB135
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the calculation of the cost of an opportunity for an adequate education
Title
Relative to the calculation of the cost of an opportunity for an adequate education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate SB135-FN-LOCAL 10/14/2021 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 8 |
2021-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-05-25 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/13/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94308033489 |
2021-04-28 | House | Executive Session: 05/20/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92551660487 |
2021-03-17 | House | Public Hearing: 03/25/2021 10:20 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96421714087 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/18/2021; Senate Journal 5 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2021-0438s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 02/18/2021; Senate Journal 5 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/18/2021; Senate Calendar 11 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/09/2021, 01:30 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 10A |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 3 |
Same As/Similar To
SB135 (Carry Over) 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207