NH SB132 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0209; Effective 09/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0209; Effective 09/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to dredging projects conducted by the Pease development authority division of ports and harbors.
Title
Relative to dredging projects conducted by the Pease development authority division of ports and harbors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0209; Effective 09/04/2015 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 54, PG. 2102 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2158e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/11/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2158-EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/11/2015); House Journal 46, PG. 1991 |
2015-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1832 |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jun 3 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1631 |
2015-05-12 | House | Executive Session: 5/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-03-31 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways (in recess of 3/12/2015); House Journal 26, PG. 1276 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/19/15; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/5/15; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Hearing: 2/17/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |