NH SB131 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Part VII Effective 10/09/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adopting omnibus legislation relative to vehicles, municipal water maintenance certificates, nondriver's picture identification, and firefighter ane emergency medical services decals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting omnibus legislation relative to vehicles, municipal water maintenance certificates, nondriver's picture identification, and firefighter ane emergency medical services decals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 307 N: 58 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - Divide Amendment 1810h (Sylvia) (Y: 90 N: 276 NV: 32 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-16SenatePart VII Effective 10/09/2021
2021-08-16SenatePart VI Effective 10/09/2021
2021-08-16SenatePart V Effective 08/10/2021
2021-08-16SenatePart IV Effective 10/09/2021
2021-08-16SenatePart III Effective 07/01/2021
2021-08-16SenatePart II Effective 10/09/2021
2021-08-16SenatePart I Effective 08/10/2021
2021-08-16SenateSigned by the Governor on 08/10/2021; Chapter 0204
2021-07-28HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-28SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-07-16SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2065e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-07-15HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2065eba: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) [&]
2021-06-10SenateSen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
2021-06-04HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1536h and 2021-1810h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 307-58 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 43
2021-06-04HouseFLAM # 2021-1810h (Rep. Walsh): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 43
2021-06-04HouseDivide 2021-1810h (Rep. Sylvia): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 90-276 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 41
2021-06-04HouseAmendment # 2021-1536h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 40
2021-06-03HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Walsh) 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 3
2021-05-25HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1536h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 13
2021-05-12HousePublic Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2021-1442h: 05/18/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99800286137
2021-05-12HouseExecutive Session: 05/18/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99800286137 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-05-04HousePublic Hearing: 05/11/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98509033579 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-31HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Transportation House Journal 4 P. 50
2021-03-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0771s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0771s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0771s, 03/18/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2021-02-17SenateRemote Hearing: 03/02/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 12
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback