NH SB131 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0096; Effective 08/19/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0096; Effective 08/19/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a permitting process for the removal of submerged logs from certain great ponds.
Title
Relative to a permitting process for the removal of submerged logs from certain great ponds.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0096; Effective 08/19/2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled 5/2/13 |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1392 |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1199 |
2013-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 4/24/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 ==Or One Hour Following House Session== |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 31, PG.1075 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0780s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0780s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0780s, 3/14/13; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 2/13/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |