NH SB128 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0550s, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a temporary change to operator compensation under the meals and rooms tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a temporary change to operator compensation under the meals and rooms tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0550s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0550s, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-11SenatePending Motion Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-11SenateSen. Giuda Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0550s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-01SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0550s, 03/11/2021; Senate Calendar 14
2021-02-03SenateRemote Hearing: 02/08/2021, 10:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=967&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB128
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=958&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=958
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=136&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0128&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB128&ddlsponsors=&lsr=967
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=137&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0128&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB128&ddlsponsors=&lsr=967
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=138&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0128&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB128&ddlsponsors=&lsr=967

Bill Comments

feedback