NH SB126 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-10 - Signed by the Governor on 08/08/2023; Chapter 0241; Effective 10/07/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-10 - Signed by the Governor on 08/08/2023; Chapter 0241; Effective 10/07/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensure requirements for telehealth services and relative to licensure of physicians and physicians assistants treating patients incarcerated with the department of corrections.
Title
Relative to licensure requirements for telehealth services and relative to licensure of physicians and physicians assistants treating patients incarcerated with the department of corrections.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Whitley [D] | Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. William Gannon [R] |
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Donovan Fenton [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/08/2023; Chapter 0241; Effective 10/07/2023 |
2023-07-28 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 18 |
2023-07-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 12 |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/30/2023 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 03/30/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/30/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0573s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0573s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0573s, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Hearing: 02/15/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |