NH SB125 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to parental reimbursement for voluntary services provided under the child in need of services (CHINS) program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to parental reimbursement for voluntary services provided under the child in need of services (CHINS) program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019
2019-05-22HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 14
2019-05-15HouseExecutive Session: 05/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Finance 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 11
2019-05-02HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 11
2019-05-07House==CONTINUED== Division III Work Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-05-06House==RECESSED== Division III Work Session: 05/07/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-04-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-04-17HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 15-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 8
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/16/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-03-26House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/09/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-03-26House==TIME CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/09/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateSpecial Order to the Present Time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback