NH SB125 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-25 - Senate Law Without Signature 6/25/11; Eff. Date 6/25/11, Chapter 0207; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-25 - Senate Law Without Signature 6/25/11; Eff. Date 6/25/11, Chapter 0207; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the standards and burden of proof with respect to the business profits tax deduction for reasonable compensation attributable to owners of partnerships, limited liability companies, and sole proprietorships.
Title
Relative to the standards and burden of proof with respect to the business profits tax deduction for reasonable compensation attributable to owners of partnerships, limited liability companies, and sole proprietorships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - House - OTP/AM 1717H(NT) (Y: 340 N: 9 NV: 47 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-25 | Senate Law Without Signature 6/25/11; Eff. Date 6/25/11, Chapter 0207; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1726 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Sen. Odell Concurs with House Amendment #1717h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.536 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1717h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 340-9; House Journal 44, PG.1555-1559 | |
2011-05-18 | House Amendment #1717h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1555-1557 | |
2011-05-10 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 39, PG.1326 | |
2011-05-10 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-1717h (New Title); House Calendar 39, PG.1348-1349 | |
2011-05-10 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1717h(NT) for May 18 (Vote 16-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1326 | |
2011-05-03 | House Executive Session: 5/10/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-04-29 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/2/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-04-26 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/28/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-04-13 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 4/26/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-03-30 | House Public Hearing: 4/5/2011 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-03-28 | House Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 30, PG.1037 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.187 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1158s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.175 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Sen. Morse Floor Amendment #2011-1158s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.175 | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/23/2011; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-3 | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/16/11; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/7/11, Room 100, State House, 11:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means, Senate Journal 3, Pg.37 |