NH SB124 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Part IV Effective 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Adopting omnibus legislation relative to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting omnibus legislation relative to insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-13SenatePart IV Effective 01/01/2022
2021-07-13SenatePart III Effective 01/01/2022
2021-07-13SenatePart II Effective 07/09/2021
2021-07-13SenatePart I Effective 10/07/2021
2021-07-13SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0119
2021-07-01HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-01SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-03HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 88
2021-05-26HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-05-26HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 16
2021-05-05HouseExecutive Session: 05/13/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93883325643
2021-04-21HousePublic Hearing: 04/27/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96624100489 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-31HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 4 P. 51
2021-03-25SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2021-0857s, and 2021-1000s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/25/2021; Senate Journal 9
2021-03-25SenateSen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2021-1000s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/25/2021; Senate Journal 9
2021-03-25SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0857s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/25/2021; Senate Journal 9
2021-03-17SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0857s, 03/25/2021; Senate Calendar 16
2021-03-04SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0375s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-03-04SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0375s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-02-17SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0375s, 03/04/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12
2021-02-10SenateRemote Hearing: 02/16/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=389&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB124
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=388&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=388
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=388
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&v=HP&id=388
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=216&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0124&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB124&ddlsponsors=&lsr=389
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=217&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0124&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB124&ddlsponsors=&lsr=389
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=218&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0124&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB124&ddlsponsors=&lsr=389

Bill Comments 750

feedback