NH SB124 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB124

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - Vetoed by Governor 07/24/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the minimum electric renewable portfolio standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the minimum electric renewable portfolio standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 214 N: 141 NV: 18 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-27SenateVetoed by Governor 07/24/2020
2020-07-10HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10
2020-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-29SenateSen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
2020-01-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2804h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-141 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 42
2020-01-09HouseAmendment # 2019-2804h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 42
2019-11-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-11-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2804h (NT) (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 30
2019-10-21HouseExecutive Session: 11/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-10-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/23/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-09-17HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-07-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-06-10HouseFull Committee Work Session: 06/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-05-22HouseRetained in Committee
2019-05-08House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/15/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-05-07HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 05/09/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-05-06HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/07/2019 09:55 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-05-01House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-04-24House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1181s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1181s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1181s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-06SenateHearing: 03/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

Same As/Similar To

SB124 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback