NH SB123 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-04 - Lay on Table (Rep. Infantine): Motion Adopted DV 355-10 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-04 - Lay on Table (Rep. Infantine): Motion Adopted DV 355-10 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to employer payment of required COVID-19 testing.
Title
Relative to employer payment of required COVID-19 testing.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
Sen. Becky Whitley [D] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Gary Woods [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Infantine): Motion Adopted DV 355-10 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 3 |
2021-05-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-05-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1758h (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 27 |
2021-05-26 | House | Executive Session: 05/26/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99484571505 |
2021-05-05 | House | Public Hearing: 05/05/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91070566113 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 4 P. 50 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0621s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0621s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0621s, 03/11/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/10/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 3 |