NH SB120 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Public Hearing: 04/13/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94103091494 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to physician assistant medical services through the Manchester Veterans Administration Medical Center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to physician assistant medical services through the Manchester Veterans Administration Medical Center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Floor Amendment 0429s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Floor Amendment 0429s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HousePublic Hearing: 04/13/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94103091494 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 48
2021-02-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0429s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/18/2021; Senate Journal 5
2021-02-18SenateSen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2021-0429s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 02/18/2021; Senate Journal 5
2021-02-18SenateSen. Sherman Moved to Remove SB 120 from the Consent Calendar; 02/18/2021; Senate Journal 5
2021-02-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/18/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2021-02-05SenateRemote Hearing: 02/10/2021, 08:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2021-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=885&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB120
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=876&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=876
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=69&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0120&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB120&ddlsponsors=&lsr=885
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=70&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0120&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB120&ddlsponsors=&lsr=885
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=69&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0120&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB120&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0885
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=70&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0120&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB120&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0885

Bill Comments

feedback