NH SB12 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2013; Chapter 0076; Effective 01/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2013; Chapter 0076; Effective 01/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to protection and preservation of significant archeological deposits.
Title
Relative to protection and preservation of significant archeological deposits.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Jacqueline Cali-Pitts [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Terie Norelli [D] |
Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2013; Chapter 0076; Effective 01/01/2014 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-04-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1257 |
2013-04-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1243 |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 24 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar33, PG.1094-1095 |
2013-04-09 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/10/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 31, PG.1073 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0235s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0235s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0235s, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 1/16/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |