NH SB119 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0268; Effective 07/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0268; Effective 07/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the joint legislative historical committee to conduct a study of state house flag restoration and preservation.
Title
Directing the joint legislative historical committee to conduct a study of state house flag restoration and preservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0268; Effective 07/24/2013 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1714 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2141c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2141c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1675 |
2013-06-20 | House | Conference Committee Report #2013-2141c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar47, PG.1537 |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/19/2013, 11:00 a.m., Room 100, State House |
2013-06-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps G.Richardson, Shurtleff, Lockwood, and Grace [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1652 |
2013-06-12 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1652 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bragdon, Odell, Watters |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Morse Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1574h, New Title; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1568 |
2013-05-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for June 5 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1428 |
2013-05-15 | House | Executive Session: 5/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-05-15 | House | Division I Work Session: 5/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Finance; House Journal 41, PG.1419 |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1574h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 284-39; House Journal 41, PG.1417-1419 |
2013-05-08 | House | Floor Amendment #2013-1574h(NT) (Rep G.Richardson): Amendment Adopted Division Vote 252-70; House Journal 41, PG.1417 |
2013-05-08 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep G.Richardson); House Journal 41, PG.1386 |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1197 |
2013-04-09 | House | Rescheduled Executive Session: 4/24/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 ==Or Following House Session== |
2013-04-09 | House | Rescheduled Public Hearing: 4/24/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 104 ==Or Following House Session== |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 35, PG.1126 |
2013-04-03 | House | Vacated from Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 35, PG.1126 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0755s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0755s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0755s, New Title, 3/14/13; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 2/5/13, Room 103, State House, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4 |