NH SB118 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the property tax relief act of 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the property tax relief act of 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-03-04SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-03-04SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-02-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/04/2021; Senate Calendar 12
2021-02-05SenateRemote Hearing: 02/09/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2021-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback