NH SB117 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1549
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1549
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to energy security and diversity.
Title
Relative to energy security and diversity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1549 |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Apr 15 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1307 |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 4/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-03-25 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 =RECESSED= |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 26, PG. 1275 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0728s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0728s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0728s, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Hearing: 2/11/15, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |