NH SB116 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-16 - Notwithstanding the Governor’s Veto, Shall SB 116 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; Senate Journal 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing the license requirement for carrying a concealed pistol or revolver.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the license requirement for carrying a concealed pistol or revolver.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-16 - Senate - Notwithstanding the Governor's veto shall the bill become law? (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Ought to Pass Amended (Y: 212 N: 150 NV: 8 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-16SenateNotwithstanding the Governor’s Veto, Shall SB 116 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; Senate Journal 20
2015-07-07SenateVetoed by Governor 07/06/2015
2015-06-24SenateEnrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19
2015-06-24HouseEnrolled; House Journal 54, PG. 2102
2015-06-17SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2149e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/11/2015); Senate Journal 19
2015-06-16HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2149-EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/11/2015); House Journal 46, PG. 1991
2015-06-04SenateSen. Carson Concurs with House Amendment #1322h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17
2015-04-29HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #1322h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 212-150; House Journal 36, PG. 1580-1583
2015-04-29HouseAmendment #1322h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1580-1583
2015-04-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2015-04-17HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1322h for Apr 29 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 32, PG. 1486
2015-03-17HousePublic Hearing: 3/24/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206-208
2015-03-04HouseIntroduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 22, PG. 629
2015-02-12SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5
2015-02-03SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/12/15; Senate Calendar 9
2015-01-22SenateHearing: 1/29/15, Representatives' Hall, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback