NH SB116 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2014; Chapter 0106; Effective 06/11/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2014; Chapter 0106; Effective 06/11/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to exceptions from licensure by the mechanical licensing board.
Title
Relative to exceptions from licensure by the mechanical licensing board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2014; Chapter 0106; Effective 06/11/2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Sen. Carson Concurs with House Amendments #2368h, New Title, and #0127h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-26 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-26 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-0949h (Rep. Umberger) Amendment Failed Div 66-236 |
2014-03-25 | House | Removed frm Consent (Rep. Umberger) |
2014-03-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 25 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2014-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 3/18/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 (Time Change) |
2014-02-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 3/6/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-02-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 3/6/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2368h(NT), #0127h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-06 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-0127h (Rep. C. McGuire) Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-06 | House | Adopt Amendment #2368h (New Title) Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-09 | House | Removed from Consent Calandar (Rep. Beaudoin) |
2013-11-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2368h for Jan 8 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-11-08 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-11-08 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/12/2013 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-10-30 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/6/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-05-29 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Organizational Work Session: 6/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-04-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/24/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 ==Or One Hour After House Session== |
2013-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/17/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 31, PG.1076 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/21/13; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0355s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0355s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0355s, 3/7/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/6/13, Room 100, State House, 9:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin; Senate Journal 4 |