NH SB116 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-22 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2368h for Jan 8 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-22 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2368h for Jan 8 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the licensure of liquefied propane installation and service technicians.
Title
Relative to the licensure of liquefied propane installation and service technicians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2368h for Jan 8 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar) |
2013-11-08 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-11-08 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/12/2013 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-10-30 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/6/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-05-29 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Organizational Work Session: 6/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-04-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/24/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 ==Or One Hour After House Session== |
2013-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/17/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 31, PG.1076 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/21/13; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0355s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0355s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0355s, 3/7/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/6/13, Room 100, State House, 9:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin; Senate Journal 4 |