NH SB115 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to making an appropriation to the department of health and human services for the purpose of funding vaccine administration through public health departments.
Title
Relative to making an appropriation to the department of health and human services for the purpose of funding vaccine administration through public health departments.
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. David Rochefort [R] |
Rep. Frances Nutter-Upham [D] | Rep. Laura Telerski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1027s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-1027s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1027s, 03/23/2023; Senate Calendar 14 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/14/2023, Room 103, State House, 02:45 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4 |