NH SB115 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - II. Remainder Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study the business environment for mental health providers in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study the business environment for mental health providers in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateII. Remainder Effective 07/12/2019
2019-07-16SenateI. Section 2 Effective 11/01/2020
2019-07-16SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 234
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2030h: Motion Adopted DV 223-125 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 69
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-2030h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 69
2019-05-22HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-22HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2030h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 16
2019-05-14HouseExecutive Session: 05/21/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-05-08HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 05/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-05-08HousePublic Hearing: 05/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-05-08HouseReferred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 14
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1545h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 14
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1545h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 14
2019-04-24HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1545h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 8
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-09House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-02HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-26HousePublic Hearing: 04/02/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0205s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0205s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0205s, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/30/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback