NH SB112 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB112
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-20 - Full Committee Work Session: 11/10/2021 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-20 - Full Committee Work Session: 11/10/2021 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to historical racing.
Title
Relative to historical racing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1005s (Y: 6 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1076s (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1005s (Y: 6 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1076s (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1005s (Y: 6 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1076s (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1005s (Y: 6 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1076s (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/10/2021 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-10-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/04/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-10-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/04/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2021-09-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/07/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-05-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Executive Session: 05/11/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91063233087 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-04-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/04/2021 10:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92340576130 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-04-14 | House | Public Hearing: 04/27/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95145735422 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-04-13 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 04/09/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 7 P. 100 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2021-1005s, Regular Calendar 6Y-18N, Amendment Failed; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Sen. Prentiss Floor Amendment # 2021-1076s, Regular Calendar 9Y-15N, Amendment Failed; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Moved to Remove SB 112 from the Consent Calendar; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/01/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/08/2021, 09:20 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 3 |
Same As/Similar To
SB112 (Carry Over) 2021-10-20 - Full Committee Work Session: 11/10/2021 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204