NH SB111 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Signed by the Governor on 06/24/2013; Chapter 0109; Effective 08/23/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Signed by the Governor on 06/24/2013; Chapter 0109; Effective 08/23/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting municipalities to establish a capital reserve plan for expenditure of capital reserve funds and relative to electronic billing by municipal utilities.
Title
Permitting municipalities to establish a capital reserve plan for expenditure of capital reserve funds and relative to electronic billing by municipal utilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/24/2013; Chapter 0109; Effective 08/23/2013 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-29 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 45, PG.1527 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-1680e, New Title; Adopted (5/2/13) |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1680e(NT) Adopted; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1390 |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 14-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1198 |
2013-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 4/17/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 31, PG.1075 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0893s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0893s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0893s, New Title, 3/21/13; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 2/13/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |