NH SB110 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Lay on Table (Rep. Abbas): Motion Adopted DV 210-158 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Lay on Table (Rep. Abbas): Motion Adopted DV 210-158 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to animals in motor vehicles.
Title
Relative to animals in motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Abbas): Motion Adopted DV 210-158 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 93 |
2021-05-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-05-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 16-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 17 |
2021-04-14 | House | Public Hearing: 04/21/2021 09:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93366148832 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 50 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0761s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0761s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0761s, 03/18/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/09/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 3 |