NH SB110 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/28/2017; Chapter 0174; Effective 06/28/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/28/2017; Chapter 0174; Effective 06/28/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring the painted turtle to be the reptile of the biennium.
Title
Declaring the painted turtle to be the reptile of the biennium.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Rep. David Murotake [R] | Rep. Patricia Klee [D] |
Rep. Martin Jack [D] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/28/2017; Chapter 0174; Effective 06/28/2017 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-13 | House | Enrolled 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 9 |
2017-06-01 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 20 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/01/2017 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 9 |
2017-05-10 | House | Executive Session: 05/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2017-04-18 | House | Public Hearing: 04/25/2017 10:50 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 11 P. 27 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1051s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1051s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1051s, 03/29/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |