NH SB108 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to school resource officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to school resource officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Reconsideration (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-03-04SenateSen. Bradley Moved Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-03-04SenateRereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Motion Failed; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-03-04SenateSen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on Rerefer, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-03-04SenateRereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-03-04SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Remove SB108 from the Consent Calendar; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-02-18SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/04/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12
2021-02-04SenateRemote Hearing: 02/09/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2021-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=867&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB108
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=858&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=96&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0108&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB108&ddlsponsors=&lsr=867
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=97&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0108&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB108&ddlsponsors=&lsr=867
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=98&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0108&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB108&ddlsponsors=&lsr=867
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=99&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0108&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB108&ddlsponsors=&lsr=867

Bill Comments 750

feedback