NH SB106 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Part II Effective 07/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Part II Effective 07/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopting omnibus legislation relative to codes.
Title
Adopting omnibus legislation relative to codes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-26 | Senate | Part II Effective 07/23/2021 |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Part I Effective 09/21/2021 |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/23/2021; Chapter 0150 |
2021-07-12 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1105h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 40 |
2021-06-03 | House | Amendment # 2021-1105h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 40 |
2021-05-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1105h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 7 |
2021-03-24 | House | Public Hearing: 03/24/2021 11:15 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/97152965622Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/11/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/03/2021, 09:20 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 3 |