NH SB106 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 106 Become Law: Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition of political advocacy organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of political advocacy organization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenateNotwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 106 Become Law: Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
2019-07-15SenateVetoed by Governor 07/10/2019
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 13
2019-05-07HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/23/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 4
2019-04-16HouseExecutive Session: 04/25/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-09HousePublic Hearing: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1200s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1200s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1200s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-21SenateHearing: 03/13/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback