NH SB105 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by the Governor on 08/11/2021; Chapter 0212; Effective 10/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing April 8, 2024 as solar eclipse day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing April 8, 2024 as solar eclipse day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-16SenateSigned by the Governor on 08/11/2021; Chapter 0212; Effective 10/10/2021
2021-07-12HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-12SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-10SenateSen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
2021-06-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0901h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 140
2021-06-03HouseAmendment # 2021-0901h: Amendment Adopted DV 350-25 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 140
2021-03-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0901h (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 22
2021-03-22HousePublic Hearing: 03/22/2021 01:30 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/94138639505Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 4 P. 48
2021-02-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0214s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4
2021-02-11SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0214s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 02/11/2021; Senate Calendar 11
2021-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0214s, 02/11/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2021-01-27SenateRemote Hearing: 02/03/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 9
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback