NH SB105 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 193; Effective 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 193; Effective 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to contributions to inaugural committees.
Title
Relative to contributions to inaugural committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 193; Effective 01/01/2020 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 16 |
2019-05-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 6 |
2019-04-30 | House | Executive Session: 05/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/18/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 69 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0886s, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2019-0886s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |